IL HB4369 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes the cost-of-living increase given to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Secretary of State, Attorney General, Comptroller, State Treasurer, and members of the General Assembly for Fiscal Year 2024. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$FY24 EX OFF & GA COLA REMOVAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
2024-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
2024-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2024-01-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback