IL HB4369 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that the State Board of Education shall develop and maintain a handbook to be made available on its Internet website that provides guidance for pupils, parents or guardians, and teachers on the subject of dyslexia. Specifies handbook requirements. Provides that the State Board shall review the handbook once every 4 years to update, if necessary, the guidelines, educational strategies, or resources and services made available in the handbook. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DYSLEXIA-HANDBOOK

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.161Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback