IL HB4369 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0617
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0617
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the State Board of Education shall develop and maintain a handbook to be made available on its Internet website that provides guidance for pupils, parents or guardians, and teachers on the subject of dyslexia. Specifies handbook requirements. Provides that the State Board shall review the handbook once every 4 years to update, if necessary, the guidelines, educational strategies, or resources and services made available in the handbook. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-DYSLEXIA-HANDBOOK
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Sommer [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0617 |
2018-07-20 | House | Effective Date July 20, 2018 |
2018-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |