IL HB4369 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Provides that a boating safety certificate is not required for a person who is temporarily using the waters of this State for the purpose of participating in a boat racing event sanctioned by the Department of Natural Resources or authorized federal agency. Requires the organizer or holder of the sanctioned event to possess liability insurance for property damage and personal injury or death with a minimum benefit of $1,000,000 that shall remain in effect through the entirety of the event. Effective immediately.
Title
BOAT RACING CERT & INSURANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0526 |
2016-07-08 | House | Effective Date July 8, 2016 |
2016-07-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2016 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2016-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 016-000-000 |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2015-12-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 45 | 5-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |