IL HB4366 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that the clerk of the circuit court of each county shall provide information for each charge judgments of guilty including the sentence pronounced by the court with statutory citations to the relevant sentencing provision beginning January 1, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM ID-STATUTORY CITATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026302.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback