IL HB4364 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Removes the requirement that a person be recommended and approved for placement in the impact incarceration program in the court's sentencing order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-IMPACT INCARCERATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2018
2018-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-8-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback