IL HB4362 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
Pending: House Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Wholesale Importation of Prescription Drugs Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to design an importation program where the State is the licensed wholesaler of imported drugs from licensed, regulated Canadian suppliers. Requires the program to address specified issues, including billing issues, cost savings issues, and safety and regulatory issues. Contains auditing and reporting requirements. Provides that the Department shall enlist the assistance of the Attorney General to identify the potential for anti-competitive behavior in industries that would be affected by an importation program. Requires the Department to submit a formal request to the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services for certification of the importation program. Requires the Department to have the program operational within 6 months after receiving the certification. Contains provisions concerning implementation requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMPORTED PRESCRIPTION DRUGS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2020-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2020-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2020-03-12HouseAssigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
2020-03-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2020-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2020-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback