IL HB4356 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Carpet Stewardship Act. Provides that within 60 days after the effective date of the Act, the Director of the Environmental Protection Agency shall appoint specified members to a clearinghouse to administer and implement a carpet stewardship program. Specifies the duties of the clearinghouse. Requires the clearinghouse to be incorporated as a nonprofit. Provides that for all carpet sold in this State, the clearinghouse shall implement, and producers shall finance, a statewide carpet stewardship program that manages the product by reducing the product's waste generation, promotes its carpet recovery and reutilization, and provides for negotiation and execution of agreements to collect, transport, process, and market the old carpet for end-of-life carpet recovery or carpet reutilization. Requires the clearinghouse to submit, by July 1, 2023 and by July 1 every 3 years thereafter, a 3-year plan to the Agency for approval. Specifies the requirements for the plan. Establishes requirements for review of the plan and requirements for producers, retailers, and distributors of carpet. Requires the clearinghouse to submit annual reports to the Agency and pay specified administrative fees. Includes enforcement provisions for the Act. Establishes requirements for State procurement of carpet in the future. Contains other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
CARPET STEWARDSHIP ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-02-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-02-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 015-004-000 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2022-02-22 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2022-02-22 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-16 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2022-02-15 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2022-02-15 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-15 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-15 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-15 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-15 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-15 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-010-000 |
2022-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-01-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-01-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |