IL HB4352 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Motion Filed Take From Table Rep. Jerry Lee Long
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that school districts need not comply with and may discharge any mandate or requirement placed on school districts by the Code or by administrative rules adopted by the State Board of Education that is unfunded; with exceptions. Provides that before a school district may lawfully discharge an unfunded mandate, it must hold a public hearing on the matter; sets forth requirements concerning the hearing. Requires a school board to report each unfunded mandate it has discharged to the State Board of Education, and requires the State Board to compile and report this information to the General Assembly each year. Repeals a Section of the Code concerning an unfunded mandates prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-UNFUNDED MANDATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseMotion Filed Take From Table Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-12HouseTabled
2018-04-12HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5
2018-04-12HouseMotion Do Not Pass Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 002-001-000; -SUBCOMMITTEE
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-11HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-10HouseTo Special Issues Subcommittee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105522-60Repealed CodeCitation Text
105522-62New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback