IL HB4348 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Missing Persons Identification Act. Provides that the responsible investigative agency shall send the National Missing and Unidentified Persons System created by the United States Department of Justice, if possible, with copies of fingerprints on standardized 8 inch by 8 inch fingerprint cards or the equivalent digital image, prints or partial prints of any fingers, a forensic odontology report concerning the body, detailed personal descriptions, DNA samples for nuclear and mitochondrial DNA analysis, available DNA analysis results, and all other identifying data, including date and place of death, of all deceased persons whose deaths are in a classification requiring inquiry by the coroner or medical examiner and who remain unidentified after all available methods have been exhausted. Provides that the medical examiner, coroner, or responsible investigative agency shall make reasonable attempts to promptly identify human remains. Defines "responsible investigative authority".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNIDENTIFIED HUMAN REMAINS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John Connor
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018
2018-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-18HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-000-001
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5072220Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback