IL HB4347 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall provide dental services to an adult who is otherwise eligible for assistance under the medical assistance program. Provides that targeted dental services, as set forth in a specified exhibit in a federal consent decree, that are provided to adults under the medical assistance program shall be reimbursed at the rates set forth in a specified column in the exhibit for targeted dental services that are provided to persons under the age of 18 under the medical assistance program. Requires the Department to actively monitor the contractual relationship between Managed Care Organizations (MCOs) and a dental administrator contracted by an MCO to provide dental services. Contains provisions concerning the Department's adoption of appropriate data and measures; the inclusion of certain dental performance measures in the Department's Health Plan Comparison Tool and Illinois Medicaid Plan Report Card; and the collection of information about the types of contracted, broad-based care coordination occurring between a MCO and any dental administrator. Prohibits a health plan from attempting to limit the right of medical assistance recipients to obtain dental services from a qualified Medicaid provider. Prohibits the Department from adopting a rule or entering into a contract that prohibits a licensed dentist or dental hygienist from receiving reimbursement under the medical assistance program for a dental encounter. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-ADULT DENTAL SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-20.4Amended CodeCitation Text
110305100New CodeSee Bill Text
11052085New CodeSee Bill Text
1106605-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11066510-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11067015-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11067520-200New CodeSee Bill Text
11068025-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11068530-205New CodeSee Bill Text
11069035-200New CodeSee Bill Text
1108053-29.12New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-30Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback