IL HB4346 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code and various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. With respect to the requirement that the events of Black History be taught in every public elementary school and high school, provides that a student may not complete the 8th grade or graduate from high school without studying this material and that a school may meet this requirement through an online program or course. Requires every public institution of higher education and community college to offer a course studying the events of Black History. Allows public institutions of higher education and community colleges to meet the requirement by offering an online course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD/HIGHER ED-BLACK HISTORY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-27HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0634
2018-07-27HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-07-27HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105511E-140New CodeSee Bill Text
105527-20.4Amended CodeCitation Text
110305100New CodeSee Bill Text
11052085New CodeSee Bill Text
1106605-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11066510-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11067015-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11067520-200New CodeSee Bill Text
11068025-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11068530-205New CodeSee Bill Text
11069035-200New CodeSee Bill Text
1108053-29.12New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback