IL HB4346 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. With respect to the requirement that the events of Black History be taught in every public elementary school and high school, provides that a student may not complete the 8th grade or graduate from high school without studying this material and that a school may meet this requirement through an online program or course. Requires every public institution of higher education and community college to offer a course studying the events of Black History. Allows public institutions of higher education and community colleges to meet the requirement by offering an online course.
Title
SCH CD/HIGHER ED-BLACK HISTORY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0634 |
2018-07-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-07-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 11E-140 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 27-20.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 305 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |