IL HB4341 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the CTE Prevention Act. Defines terms. Provides that a child under the age of 12 may not participate in tackle football offered by an organized youth sports program. Provides that a child under the age of 12 may participate in all other athletic activities offered by an organized youth sports program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CTE PREVENTION ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-03-01HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Mental Health Committee; 011-009-000
2018-02-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-02-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Mental Health Committee; Rep. Carol Sente
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-01-30HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-01-30HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Laura Fine
2018-01-30HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-01-30HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-01-30HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-01-30HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback