IL HB4340 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Human Trafficking Resource Center Notice Act. To the list of entities required to post the notice under the Act, adds: massage parlors and bath houses; public gatherings and special events conducted on property open to the public that require the issuance of a permit from the unit of local government; establishments used primarily for gaming and where gaming equipment or supplies are used or offered for use for the purpose of accruing business revenue; and public and private elementary and secondary schools. Provides that the Department of Revenue or the governmental entity regulating a business or establishment (instead of the Department of Labor) shall monitor and enforce compliance with the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRAFFICKING RESOURCE NOTICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Connelly
2018-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 010-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7755020Amended CodeCitation Text
775505Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4340&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4340.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4340eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4340enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4340ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4340ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4340sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4340_04252018_022000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4340_05232018_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4340sam001_05312018_040000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback