IL HB4339 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that in a proceeding for the prosecution of an offense of criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, aggravated criminal sexual assault, criminal sexual abuse, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse, the court, on a motion by the prosecuting attorney, may order that the defendant question the victim through a court-appointed attorney when the defendant has waived his or her right to counsel and is representing himself or herself pro se, when the victim's testimony will describe an act or attempted act of sexual conduct, and the court finds that requiring the victim to be questioned directly by the defendant will cause the victim to suffer serious emotional or mental distress. Provides that the defendant shall be allowed to communicate with the court-appointed attorney.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-SEXUAL ABUSE VICTIMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255115-7.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback