IL HB4331 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that in every case in which an opioid overdose is determined to be a contributing factor in a death, the coroner shall report the death and the age, gender, race, and county of residence, if known, of the decedent to the Department of Public Health. Amends the University of Illinois Hospital Act and the Hospital Licensing Act. Requires every hospital to report the age, gender, race, and county of residence, if known, of each patient diagnosed as having an opioid overdose to the Department within 48 hours of the diagnosis. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department to adopt rules to implement the reporting requirements. Requires the Department to annually report to the General Assembly the data collected.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OPIOID OVERDOSE REPORTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1103308.5New CodeSee Bill Text
2023102310-316New CodeSee Bill Text
210856.09cNew CodeSee Bill Text
5553-3013Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback