IL HB4329 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Not For Profit Corporation Act of 1986. Includes the purpose of ownership and operation of a public wastewater service or system on a mutual or cooperative basis to the list of purposes for which a not-for-profit corporation may be organized under the Act. Exempts any director of a corporation that is organized for the purpose of (i) operating water supply facilities for drinking and general domestic use on a mutual or cooperative basis or (ii) ownership and operation of a public wastewater service or system on a mutual or cooperative basis from liability for damages resulting from the exercise of judgment or discretion in connection with his or her duties or responsibilities, with certain exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BUS ORG-PUBLIC WASTEWATER SYTM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
805105103.05Amended CodeCitation Text
805105108.70Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback