IL HB4328 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Motor Carrier Safety Law of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Department of State Police (instead of the Department of Transportation in conjunction with the Department of State Police) shall administer the Law. Amends the Illinois Hazardous Materials Transportation Act to provide that the Department of State Police (instead of the Department of Transportation) shall administer the Act. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that beginning fiscal year 2019, $20,000,000 shall be appropriated from the Road Fund to the Department of State Police to administer the Illinois Motor Carrier Safety Law and Illinois Hazardous Materials Safety Act. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
ISP-MOTOR CARRIER SAFETY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-001-000 |
2018-02-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 8.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 30 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 18b-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 18b-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 18b-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 18b-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4328&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4328.htm |