IL HB4326 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1062
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1062
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that 1% of the school facility occupation taxes collected shall be distributed to the regional superintendent of schools (currently, these moneys are deposited into the Tax Compliance and Administration Fund) to cover the costs in administering and enforcing the provisions of the school facility occupation taxes Section of the Code. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
SCHOOL FACILITY OCCUP REVENUE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1062 |
2022-06-10 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2022 |
2022-06-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2022-02-17 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-15 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-02-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-02-03 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2022-01-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-01-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-01-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1006.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |