IL HB4324 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Social Gaming Act. Provides that no person may operate a social gaming board game or manufacture and distribute social gaming boards without a license issued by the Illinois Gaming Board. Provides that the Board shall license social gaming board manufacturers, social gaming board distributors, and social gaming locations and specifies license fees. Provides that the Board shall report to the Governor and the General Assembly, no later than December 31, 2024 and each year thereafter through 2028, on the implementation and administration of the Act. Sets forth provisions concerning license fees, maximum payouts, and relief from disciplinary actions. Provides that the Board shall adopt rules and emergency rules to implement and administer the Act. Makes a conforming change in the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Effective immediately.
Title
SOCIAL GAMING ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Gaming Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4324&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4324.htm |