IL HB4324 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Hearing: May 23 @ 10:00 am in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Wage Lien Act. Provides that a lien exists on an employer's property for the amount of unpaid wages owed to an employee. Defines terms and includes provisions concerning creation of the lien; exemptions; notice; limitations; recording of the lien; enforcement; other claims on the employer's property; successor obligations; and construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WAGE LIEN ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenatePostponed - Labor
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 088-003-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-09HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-03-08HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-03-01HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-01HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 015-011-000
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback