IL HB4319 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0633
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends "An Act concerning land", Public Act 95-982. Provides that the conveyance of certain real property shall be made subject to the condition that title to the buildings and the land shall revert to the State of Illinois, Department of Corrections, if Peoria County ceases to use the buildings and the land for a public or private purpose (instead of "a public purpose"). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HANNA WORK CAMP-USE OF LAND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-27HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0633
2018-07-27HouseEffective Date July 27, 2018
2018-07-27HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback