IL HB4318 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is unlawful for a sex offender to knowingly reside within one mile (rather than 500 feet) of the victim of the sex offense regardless of the age of the victim at the time of the offense (currently, the prohibition only applies to child sex offenders and does not apply when the victim attains 21 years of age). Provides that nothing in this provision prohibits a sex offender from residing within one mile (rather than 500 feet) of the victim if the property in which the sex offender resides is owned by the sex offender and was purchased before the effective date of the bill, unless otherwise prohibited by law before the effective date of the bill. Provides that for the purposes of this provision, "sex offender" includes a "child sex offender". Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes.
Title
CRIM CD-SEX OFFENDER-RESIDENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled |
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Do Not Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-002-000; -SUBCOMMITTEE |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-12 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-9.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-9.4-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8A-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4318&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4318.htm |