IL HB4318 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning PPV leases, provides that the current method of classifying and valuing PPV leases expires on the earlier of (i) January 1, 2056 or (ii) January 1 of the calendar year in which the particular PPV lease terminates (now, January 1, 2016). Provides that, for naval training facilities, naval bases, and naval support facilities, "net operating income" means all revenues received minus the lesser of (i) 42% of all revenues or (ii) actual expenses before interest, taxes, depreciation, and amortization (now, all revenues received minus the lesser of (i) 62% of all revenues or (ii) actual expenses before interest, taxes, depreciation, and amortization). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-PPV LEASES
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Drury [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2014-03-06 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2014-03-05 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2014-03-04 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2014-03-03 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2014-02-28 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2014-02-28 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2014-02-28 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2014-02-27 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2014-02-27 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2014-02-27 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2014-02-27 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-27 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-27 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-27 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-27 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-27 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-27 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-27 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-27 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-27 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-20 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 10-365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 10-370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 10-380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4318&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4318.htm |