IL HB4317 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Service Member Residential Property Act. Provides that if a service member who has entered into certain residential leases is killed in action or while on active duty, then the immediate family or dependents of the service member may terminate the lease. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SERVICE MEMBERS-LEASES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-07HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-03-07HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-02-13HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-13HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
330625-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback