IL HB4315 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Agritourism Liability Act. Provides that an agritourism operator is not liable for injury or death of a participant resulting from the inherent risks of agritourism activities if the agritourism operator posts the required warning notice. Provides that a participant assumes the inherent risks of an agritourism activity by engaging in the agritourism activity. Provides that no participant may pursue an action or recover from an agritourism operator for injury, loss, damage, or death of the participant resulting from any of the inherent risks of agritourism activities. Provides that nothing prevents or limits the liability of an agritourism operator if the agritourism operator: (1) commits an act or omission that constitutes willful or wanton disregard for the safety of the participant and that act or omission proximately causes injury, damage, or death to the participant; or (2) has actual knowledge or reasonably should know of an unusual dangerous condition on the land, facilities, or equipment used in the activity or the dangerous propensity of a particular animal used in such an activity, does not make the danger known to the participant, and the danger proximately causes injury, damage, or death to the participant. Provides that an agritourism operator shall post and maintain a warning notice in a clearly visible location at or near the entrance to the agritourism activity.
Title
AGRITOURISM LIABILITY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-02-26 | House | To Tort Liability Subcommittee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4315&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4315.htm |