IL HB4312 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person who violates a provision in the Code governing the operation of a vehicle approaching a stationary emergency vehicle commits a petty (rather than business) offense punishable by fine of not more than $75 (rather than a fine of not less than $100 or more than $10,000). Provides that a person who violates the provision when the violation results in damage to the property of another person commits a business offense punishable by a fine of not less than $100 and not more than $10,000. Provides that a person who violates the provision when the violation results in injury or death of another person commits a Class A misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-EMERGENCY VEH-PENALTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-02SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-907Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback