IL HB4310 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Provides that a Veterans Home shall notify the residents of the Veterans Home, the families of residents at the Veterans Home, employees of the Veterans Home, and individuals working on contract at the Veterans Home within 24 hours of an outbreak of Legionnaires' disease at the Veterans Home. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS HOMES-LEGIONNAIRES'

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 006-001-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-15SenateRe-assigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenatePostponed - Veterans Affairs
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-13HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans' Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-03-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2028052.13New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback