IL HB4309 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0850
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Frail Individual Family Visitation Protection Act. Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Kasem/Baksys Visitation Law. Defines "frail individual" and other terms. Provides that if a caregiver unreasonably prevents a family member of a frail individual from visiting the frail individual, the court, upon a verified petition by the family member, may order the caregiver to permit visitation between the frail individual and the family member if the court finds that the visitation is in the frail individual's best interests. Provides that in making its determination, the court shall consider the standards provided in the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that the caregiver shall provide a person awarded reasonable visitation with notice of the frail individual's hospitalization or transfer to a healthcare facility, relocation to another residence, and death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FRAIL INDIVIDUALS-VISITATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0850
2018-08-14HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-14HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2018
2018-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-001-000
2018-05-16SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-07HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-03-07HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-02-28HouseTo Trusts & Estates Law Subcommittee
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback