IL HB4309 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0850
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0850
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Frail Individual Family Visitation Protection Act. Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Kasem/Baksys Visitation Law. Defines "frail individual" and other terms. Provides that if a caregiver unreasonably prevents a family member of a frail individual from visiting the frail individual, the court, upon a verified petition by the family member, may order the caregiver to permit visitation between the frail individual and the family member if the court finds that the visitation is in the frail individual's best interests. Provides that in making its determination, the court shall consider the standards provided in the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that the caregiver shall provide a person awarded reasonable visitation with notice of the frail individual's hospitalization or transfer to a healthcare facility, relocation to another residence, and death.
Title
FRAIL INDIVIDUALS-VISITATION
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Jimenez [R] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0850 |
2018-08-14 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-001-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-03-07 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-02-28 | House | To Trusts & Estates Law Subcommittee |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |