IL HB4303 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Creates the Tamms Minimum Security Unit Task Force. Provides for membership on the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall study the subject of a practical, efficient, and beneficial repurposing of the Tamms Minimum Security Unit and its property for the benefit of the public, including the possibility of providing mental health services, health services, public safety, law enforcement training purposes, fire services, medical training, incarceration of elderly, ill, or disabled inmates, and any other option for repurposing that the Task Force deems appropriate. Provides that each member of the Task Force shall serve without compensation. Provides that the Task Force shall meet 2 times per year or at the call of the Chairperson. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall provide administrative support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2024 with its recommendations and is dissolved on January 1, 2025. Repeals these provisions on January 1, 2025. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-TAMMS REPURPOSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2023-12-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Paul Jacobs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-20-1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback