IL HB4297 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Changes the name of the Act to the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Persons under 21 Years of Age and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Raises the age for whom tobacco products, electronic cigarettes, and alternative nicotine products may be sold from at least 18 years of age to at least 21 years of age. Eliminates the penalty for possession of a cigar, cigarette, smokeless tobacco, or tobacco in any of its forms by persons under 18 years of age. Defines "electronic cigarette". Repeals the Smokeless Tobacco Limitation Act. Amends various other Acts to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOBACCO PRODUCTS-UNDER 21

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee; 003-001-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-03-21HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-03-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-06HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-02-16HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-02-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-02-13HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee; 003-001-000
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-01-31HouseAssigned to Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee
2018-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23553-12Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-16.1Amended CodeCitation Text
351306Amended CodeCitation Text
3514310-25Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-615Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7206750.01Amended CodeCitation Text
7206751Amended CodeCitation Text
7206751.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
7206752Amended CodeCitation Text
720675Act titleAmended CodeCitation Text
72067710Amended CodeCitation Text
72067715Amended CodeCitation Text
7206775Amended CodeCitation Text
7206781Amended CodeCitation Text
7206785Amended CodeCitation Text
7206786Amended CodeCitation Text
7206787Amended CodeCitation Text
7206788Amended CodeCitation Text
720680ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
7206852Amended CodeCitation Text
7206854Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback