IL HB4289 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that all children with autism spectrum disorder who are otherwise eligible for medical assistance shall receive coverage for any medically necessary evidence-based treatment prescribed by a physician licensed under the Medical Practice Act of 1987 to practice medicine in all of its branches or a licensed practitioner of the healing arts as defined in the Illinois Administrative Code. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-AUTISM SPECTRUM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-01-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback