IL HB4288 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0826
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Veterans Preference Act. Provides that persons who have been members of the National Guard of any state (rather than the Illinois National Guard) shall be given preference under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS PREFERENCE ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0826
2018-08-13HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-13HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-20HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
330551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback