IL HB4287 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that the posting of bail by a defendant shall not be a factor when considering if he or she qualifies for the appointment of a Public Defender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BAIL POSTING-PUBLIC DEFENDER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-01-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-01-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255113-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback