IL HB4286 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a school bus may be equipped with an arm extension attached to the stop signal arm that may not extend more than 36 inches past the outermost part of the stop sign, may not exceed 4 inches wide, shall be made of aluminum or a polycarbonate material, shall be illuminated in red on both sides, and may not change the integrity of the school bus. Provides that, if a school bus is equipped with an additional stop signal arm on the rear of the bus, an arm extension may be attached, but it may not extend more than 12 inches past the outermost part of the rear stop sign.
Title
VEH CD-SCHOOL BUSES
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |