IL HB4284 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. In provisions concerning a motor vehicle transfer tax when the transfer is pursuant to the administration of an estate and the beneficiary is not a surviving spouse, provides that those provisions also apply to the administration of an inter vivos trust that became irrevocable upon the death of the grantor. Effective immediately.
Title
VEHICLE USE TAX-TRUSTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0762 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-28 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |