IL HB4284 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, for State Board of Education appointments made after the effective date of the amendatory Act, 3 of the members of the State Board must represent the educator community. Sets forth the qualifications for these members and makes other changes with regard to the qualifications of members of the State Board. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ST BD ED-EDUCATOR MEM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 85 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-11-14SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 15, 2018
2018-11-14HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Passed 085-027-000
2018-11-14House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-13HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2018-08-19HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-014-000
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-001-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-019-002
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10551A-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10551A-2Amended CodeCitation Text
10551A-2.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback