IL HB4282 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the owner of record of territory may have the territory disconnected from the corporate limits of a municipality if it does not contain any territory designated as part of a redevelopment project area or any territory otherwise subject to tax increment financing by the municipality. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-TERRITORY DISCONNECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 73 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1134
2018-11-30HouseEffective Date November 28, 2018
2018-11-28HouseBoth Houses Override Total Veto
2018-11-28SenateOverride Governor Veto - Senate Passed 050-001-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-15SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-11-14SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 15, 2018
2018-11-14HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Passed 073-035-002
2018-11-14House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-14HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2018-08-19HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Local Government; 005-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-045-002
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-07HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-02-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-002-000
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6557-3-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4282&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4282.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4282eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4282enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4282gms.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1134.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4282ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4282_04112018_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4282_05232018_019000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4282_11142018_006000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4282_11282018_005000M.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback