IL HB4280 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Motion Withdrawn Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to establish and maintain the Growing Future Educators Program to train high school graduates who at one time have been identified as English learners and who are enrolled in an approved educator preparation program, among other qualifications, to become secondary language educators. Provides that each school district that chooses to participate in the Program shall partner with one public, regionally accredited institution of higher education in this State that offers a pre-approved educator preparation program and each qualified high school graduate participating in the program through the district must be enrolled at that institution in its educator preparation program. Provides that for each semester that a qualified high school graduate is participating in the program, the State Board shall issue the person a paraprofessional educator endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations and the person must be employed as a part-time employee by the participating district as a paraprofessional working under the supervision of a district employee with a Professional Educator License. Sets forth provisions concerning funding, submitting program data, reporting to the General Assembly, and rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-GROWING FUTURE EDUCATOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo SPECIAL Issues Subcommittee
2018-04-12HouseRemains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 001-002-000; -FAILED
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-11HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-02-07HouseTo Special Issues Subcommittee
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-05HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2018-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.173New CodeSee Bill Text
105521B-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback