IL HB4279 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Natural Resources Act. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources has the authority to accept, receive, and administer on behalf of the State, federal grant funds associated with the development or preservation of recreational boating infrastructure on this State's waterways and distribute those funds as prescribed by the appropriate federal agency. Provides that funds received by the Department shall be deposited into the Natural Resources Federal Boating Infrastructure Grant Dollars Fund and used for these purposes. Makes conforming changes in the State Finance Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNR-RECREATIONAL BOAT FUNDING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-05-17SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-000-000
2018-03-01HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2018-03-01HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-14HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
208011-15Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback