IL HB4278 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Requires that, if an Illinois Veterans Home administrator or a member of the administrative staff is notified that, within one month or less, 2 or more persons residing within the Veterans Home are diagnosed with an infectious disease by a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches; a hospital licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act or organized under the University of Illinois Hospital Act; a long-term care facility licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act; a freestanding emergency center licensed under the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act; a local health department; or any other State agency or government entity, then, within 24 hours after the facility is notified of the second diagnosis, the Illinois Veterans Home must: (1) provide a written notification of the incidence of the infectious disease to each resident of the facility and the resident's emergency contact or next of kin; (2) post a notification of the incidence of the infectious disease in a conspicuous place near the main entrance to the Illinois Veterans Home; and (3) provide a written notification to the Department of Veterans' Affairs and the Department of Public Health of the incidence of the infectious disease and of compliance with the notification requirements concerning residents and the resident's emergency contact or next of kin. Requires that, in addition to the initial written notifications, the Veterans Home must provide written notifications of any updates on the incidence of the infectious disease and any options that are available to the residents. Provides that the Department of Veterans' Affairs and the Department of Public Health must post the notification of the incidence of the infectious disease, any updates, and any options that are available to the residents on their websites. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS HOME-NOTICE-DISEASE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-01-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-01-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-01-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2028052.01cNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback