IL HB4275 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Physical Fitness Services Act. Provides that no contract for basic physical fitness services shall require payment of a total amount in excess of $6,500 (rather than $2500) per year, with certain exceptions; and that no contract for family or couple memberships for basic physical fitness services shall require payment in excess of $6,500 (rather than $2,500) per year per person covered under the membership. In a provision permitting a person to renew a contract for physical fitness services for consecutive periods of not more than one year each, removes the requirement that each renewal be for a reasonable consideration not less than 10% of the cash price of the original membership. Effective June 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HLTH CLUB MEMBERSHIP FEE LIMIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-005-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-001
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-025-001
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8156458Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback