IL HB4268 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Home Repair and Remodeling Act. Provides that "residence" means a single-family home or dwelling or a multiple-family home or dwelling containing 6 or fewer apartments, condominiums, town houses, or dwelling units, used or intended to be used by the consumer as his or her dwelling place (instead of "by occupants as dwelling places"). In the home repair consumer rights pamphlet, replaces notice language concerning lien waivers with the following: "Illinois law requires that, before payment, your contractor give you a sworn statement which lists: (1) all the persons or companies your contractor hired to work on your home and their addresses; and (2) the amounts previously paid, the amounts about to be paid, and the total amount owed after the payment to these persons or companies. The sworn statement should be fully completed, signed, and notarized. When the contractor's sworn statement lists an amount due or to become due to a subcontractor, or when a subcontractor gives you notice of an amount due to the subcontractor, you must retain sufficient funds to pay that subcontractor. Subcontractors give the contractors lien waivers when they are paid. Ask your contractor for copies of these lien waivers. If your contractor tells you he or she needs a payment from you in order to pay subcontractors, you have the right to pay the subcontractors directly.".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOME REPAIR-CONSUMER NOTICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0670
2018-08-03HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-03HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-000
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2018-01-31HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
81551310Amended CodeCitation Text
81551320Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback