IL HB4268 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Home Repair and Remodeling Act. Provides that "residence" means a single-family home or dwelling or a multiple-family home or dwelling containing 6 or fewer apartments, condominiums, town houses, or dwelling units, used or intended to be used by the consumer as his or her dwelling place (instead of "by occupants as dwelling places"). In the home repair consumer rights pamphlet, replaces notice language concerning lien waivers with the following: "Illinois law requires that, before payment, your contractor give you a sworn statement which lists: (1) all the persons or companies your contractor hired to work on your home and their addresses; and (2) the amounts previously paid, the amounts about to be paid, and the total amount owed after the payment to these persons or companies. The sworn statement should be fully completed, signed, and notarized. When the contractor's sworn statement lists an amount due or to become due to a subcontractor, or when a subcontractor gives you notice of an amount due to the subcontractor, you must retain sufficient funds to pay that subcontractor. Subcontractors give the contractors lien waivers when they are paid. Ask your contractor for copies of these lien waivers. If your contractor tells you he or she needs a payment from you in order to pay subcontractors, you have the right to pay the subcontractors directly.".
Title
HOME REPAIR-CONSUMER NOTICES
Sponsors
Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0670 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-01-31 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 513 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 513 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |