IL HB4266 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that a taxpayer who makes a donation to a qualified charitable entity of: (i) disposable diapers; (ii) other hygiene products for infants or children; (iii) menstrual hygiene products; or (iv) cash that is specifically designated for the purchase of the those products is entitled to an income tax credit in an amount equal to the cost of the donation, but not to exceed $1,000 per taxpayer in any taxable year. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CHARITABLE DONATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-10 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4266&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4266.htm |