IL HB4265 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that if an offender defaults in the payment of a fine or any installment of that fine, the court may issue a summons for his or her appearance (deletes warrant of arrest). Provides that the court may issue a warrant of arrest, if after being served with a summons, the offender fails to appear for the scheduled hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-FINES-DEFAULT-WARRANT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 35 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Lost 035-069-001
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-002-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-9-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback