IL HB4259 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0986
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0986
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, except for a semitrailer registered under the Code, beginning with the 2019 registration year, the Secretary of State shall offer to each owner of a motor vehicle that is subject to registration under the Code a registration period based on a one calendar year, 2 calendar year, 3 calendar year, 4 calendar year, or 5 calendar year basis. Provides that an owner of a motor vehicle who chooses a 2 calendar year, 3 calendar year, 4 calendar year, or 5 calendar year registration period shall pay an additional fee of $10 for every registration year that is more than one calendar year, which shall be deposited into the Road Fund. Provides that beginning with the 2019 registration year, the Secretary shall offer to each owner of a trailer a registration period based on a one calendar year, 2 calendar year, 3 calendar year, 4 calendar year, 5 calendar year, or 10 calendar year basis.
Title
VEH CD-MULTI YEAR REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] |
Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0986 |
2018-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2021 |
2018-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-02-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-414.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |