IL HB4254 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission, in consultation with the Illinois Power Agency, shall develop standards and guidelines to prohibit any Illinois ratepayer funds from being used by the Agency for the procurement of solar panels that are not manufactured or assembled by a company located in the United States under the Agency's long-term renewable resources procurement plan.
Title
POWER AGENCY-SOLAR PROCUREMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | To Clean Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-12-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-12-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-12-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-12-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-12-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-12-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-12-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-12-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-12-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4254&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4254.htm |